EP3936810 - GAS HEADER, HEAT EXCHANGER, AND REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEMURA, Takamasa c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SUN, Faming c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
ONAKA, Yoji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Yohei c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
YONEDA, Norihiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/32] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
UEMURA, Takamasa Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
SUN, Faming Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
ONAKA, Yoji Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
KATO, Yohei Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
05 /
YONEDA, Norihiro Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2022/02] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19918290.8 | 05.03.2019 | [2022/02] | WO2019JP08507 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020178966 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936810 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3936810 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F28F9/22, F28D1/053 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
F28D1/05316 (EP);
F25B39/04 (US);
F25B39/00 (EP);
F28D1/053 (US);
F28F1/02 (US);
F28F9/02 (US);
F28F9/0214 (EP);
F28F9/0243 (EP);
F28F9/0265 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | F28F9/02, F28F9/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASKOPFTEIL, WÄRMETAUSCHER UND KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2022/02] | English: | GAS HEADER, HEAT EXCHANGER, AND REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2022/02] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE GAZ, ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET DISPOSITIF À CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2021 | Translation filed | 26.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH04174297 (ZEXEL CORP) [Y] 2-7, 9, 12-13 * , fig. 5, 13 & US 5203407 A, fig. 5, 13 *; | [Y]JP2009092359 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 5-7, 9, 12-13* , paragraph [0041], fig. 4 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]WO2018225252 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0095], fig. 1-16 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-7, 9, 12-13 [A] 8, 10-11 | by applicant | JPH0367869U |