EP3918962 - COOKING UTENSIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foshan Shunde Midea Electrical Heating Appliances Manufacturing Co., Ltd. San Le Road 19 Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Junshan San Le Road 19, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Zhixi San Le Road 19, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 03 /
LV, Weigang San Le Road 19, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Yun San Le Road 19, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Yonggang San Le Road 19, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 06 /
HAN, Pingying San Le Road 19, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
LU, Junshan Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | ||
02 /
CHENG, Zhixi Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | |||
03 /
LV, Weigang Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | |||
04 /
YANG, Yun Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Yonggang Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | |||
06 /
HAN, Pingying Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19918398.9 | 12.10.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019CN110821 | Priority number, date | CN201910164767 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910164767 | [2021/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020177323 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918962 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/08, A47J27/086, A47J37/06 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
A47J27/086 (EP,CN,US);
A47J27/08 (CN);
A47J36/32 (EP);
A47J37/0641 (EP,US);
A47J37/105 (CN);
A47J37/1209 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | A47J37/06, A47J27/08, A47J27/086 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | KOCHUTENSIL | [2021/49] | English: | COOKING UTENSIL | [2021/49] | French: | USTENSILE DE CUISSON | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2021 | Translation filed | 31.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN202312830U (GUANGDONG TREDY ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-5,9,10* figures 1,2 *; | [X]CN108158418 (DEA GENERAL AVIATION HOLDING CO LTD) [X] 1-5,9,10 * figures 1,4 *; | [X]CN108402891 (SHARKNINJA HONG KONG COMPANY LTD) [X] 1-5,9-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2019045973 (GILL AARON MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14 * paragraphs [0053] , [0081]; figures 3A,7 * [I] 8 |