Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3938180

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure09.03.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Entry into regional phase12.08.2021National basic fee paid 
12.08.2021Search fee paid 
12.08.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2021Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 07
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.09.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:17.12.2021 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:17.12.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:19.01.2022 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20210812
 
Event date:19.01.2022 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:22.06.2022 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:22.06.2022 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.
 
Event date:22.06.2022 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B22F 10/14 20210101AFI20220822BHEP
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 10/00 20150101ALI20220822BHEP
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 40/20 20200101ALI20220822BHEP
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 70/10 20200101ALI20220822BHEP
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C09D 11/38 20140101ALI20220822BHEP
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C09D 11/106 20140101ALI20220822BHEP
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C09D 11/107 20140101ALI20220822BHEP
 
Event date:28.09.2022 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20220826
 
Event date:22.08.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B29C0064165000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B22F0010140000
 
Event date:30.04.2025 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:PERIDOT PRINT LLC