EP3944731 - MOUNTING HEAD MAINTENANCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2025 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI Motokazu c/o FUJI CORPORATION, 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2024/25] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
MURAKAMI Motokazu Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 19919641.1 | 18.03.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019JP11250 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020188712 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944731 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3944731 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04, H05K13/08, B08B5/04 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H05K13/0895 (EP,US);
B08B5/04 (EP);
H05K13/0404 (EP);
H05K13/0409 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | H05K13/04, H05K13/08, B08B5/00, G05B1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/04] | H05K13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEKOPFWARTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/04] | English: | MOUNTING HEAD MAINTENANCE DEVICE | [2022/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTENANCE DE TÊTE DE MONTAGE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | Translation filed | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2025 | No opposition filed within time limit [2025/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.06.2024 | BG | 19.06.2024 | CZ | 19.06.2024 | DK | 19.06.2024 | EE | 19.06.2024 | ES | 19.06.2024 | FI | 19.06.2024 | HR | 19.06.2024 | IT | 19.06.2024 | LV | 19.06.2024 | NL | 19.06.2024 | PL | 19.06.2024 | RO | 19.06.2024 | SK | 19.06.2024 | SM | 19.06.2024 | NO | 19.09.2024 | RS | 19.09.2024 | GR | 20.09.2024 | IS | 19.10.2024 | PT | 21.10.2024 | [2025/21] |
Former [2025/11] | AT | 19.06.2024 | |
BG | 19.06.2024 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2024 | ||
EE | 19.06.2024 | ||
ES | 19.06.2024 | ||
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
IT | 19.06.2024 | ||
LV | 19.06.2024 | ||
NL | 19.06.2024 | ||
PL | 19.06.2024 | ||
RO | 19.06.2024 | ||
SK | 19.06.2024 | ||
SM | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
RS | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
IS | 19.10.2024 | ||
PT | 21.10.2024 | ||
Former [2025/10] | AT | 19.06.2024 | |
BG | 19.06.2024 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2024 | ||
EE | 19.06.2024 | ||
ES | 19.06.2024 | ||
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
LV | 19.06.2024 | ||
NL | 19.06.2024 | ||
PL | 19.06.2024 | ||
RO | 19.06.2024 | ||
SK | 19.06.2024 | ||
SM | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
RS | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
IS | 19.10.2024 | ||
PT | 21.10.2024 | ||
Former [2025/09] | AT | 19.06.2024 | |
BG | 19.06.2024 | ||
EE | 19.06.2024 | ||
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
LV | 19.06.2024 | ||
NL | 19.06.2024 | ||
PL | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
RS | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
IS | 19.10.2024 | ||
PT | 21.10.2024 | ||
Former [2025/08] | BG | 19.06.2024 | |
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
LV | 19.06.2024 | ||
NL | 19.06.2024 | ||
PL | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
RS | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
PT | 21.10.2024 | ||
Former [2025/03] | BG | 19.06.2024 | |
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
LV | 19.06.2024 | ||
NL | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
RS | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
PT | 21.10.2024 | ||
Former [2024/52] | BG | 19.06.2024 | |
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
LV | 19.06.2024 | ||
NL | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
RS | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | BG | 19.06.2024 | |
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
LV | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
RS | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | BG | 19.06.2024 | |
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | ||
GR | 20.09.2024 | ||
Former [2024/46] | BG | 19.06.2024 | |
FI | 19.06.2024 | ||
HR | 19.06.2024 | ||
NO | 19.09.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02165697 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP2838332 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]); | [A]EP3021649 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]); | [A]EP3166378 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH11340689 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO2017126031 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]); | [A]WO2018179300 (FUJI CORP [JP]) | by applicant | WO2013153598 |