EP3938979 - INDIVIDUALIZED MEDICINE USING CAUSAL MODELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROOKS, Brian E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BENOIT, Gilles J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
OLSON, Peter O. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
OLSON, Tyler W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
NAYAR, Himanshu 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
ARSENAULT, Frederick J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
JOHNSON, Nicholas A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
WOULFE, Susan L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
TOMAI, Mark A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
BROOKS, Brian E. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
BENOIT, Gilles J. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
OLSON, Peter O. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
OLSON, Tyler W. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
NAYAR, Himanshu Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
06 /
ARSENAULT, Frederick J. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
07 /
JOHNSON, Nicholas A. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
08 /
WOULFE, Susan L. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
09 /
TOMAI, Mark A. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 19920468.6 | 03.10.2019 | [2022/03] | WO2019IB58423 | Priority number, date | US201962818816P | 15.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962818816 P | US201962898797P | 11.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962898797 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020188333 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938979 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G16H20/10, G16H20/40, G16H50/20 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/021 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/14546 (US);
A61B5/4815 (US);
A61B5/4824 (US);
A61B5/4848 (US);
A61M16/026 (US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | G06Q10/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | INDIVIDUALISIERTE MEDIZIN MIT KAUSALEN MODELLEN | [2022/03] | English: | INDIVIDUALIZED MEDICINE USING CAUSAL MODELS | [2022/03] | French: | MÉDICAMENT INDIVIDUALISÉ UTILISANT DES MODÈLES CAUSAUX | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 22.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011132370 (FARRUGIA STEVEN PAUL [AU]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0020] ** paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0073] *; | [XI]US2015006192 (SUDHARSAN BHARATH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0045] * [I] 3-5,9-15; | [XI]US2017277841 (SHANKAR SUSHANT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0049] * [I] 4,5,9-11,13-15 | International search | US2010330155 [a] (BERRY DAVID ARTHUR [US], et al)[a] 1-4,20-22; | US2014253358 [x] (LORENZ PERRY SCOTT [US]) [x] 1-4,20-22 | by applicant | US2015006192 | US2017277841 |