EP3943366 - CART FOR STOPPING IN PARALLEL WITH INSTALLATION AND MOVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Hye Ri IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
PARK, Hye Ri Seoul 06772 / KR | Representative(s) | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19920565.9 | 19.03.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019KR03182 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020189818 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943366 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3943366 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B62B5/00, B62B3/14 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G05D1/0238 (EP);
B25J11/008 (KR);
B25J13/085 (KR);
B25J19/02 (KR);
B25J9/1666 (KR);
B25J9/1676 (KR);
G05D1/0246 (EP);
B62B3/14 (EP);
B62B5/0006 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | B62B5/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WAGEN ZUM PARALLELEN ANHALTEN MIT MONTAGE- UND BEWEGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/04] | English: | CART FOR STOPPING IN PARALLEL WITH INSTALLATION AND MOVING METHOD | [2022/04] | French: | CHARIOT DESTINÉ À S'ARRÊTER EN PARALLÈLE AVEC UNE INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPLACEMENT | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2021 | Translation filed | 15.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.01.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014091611 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* figures 7-10; claim 1 *; | [XI]EP3184012 (TOSHIBA LIFESTYLE PRODUCTS & SERVICES CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10,12,14 * figures 1-15; claims 1-7 * [I] 4,6,11,13; | [A]US2017332862 (JUN WOOCHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-26; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH05286453 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 1-14; | [Y]KR20130136113 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14; | [Y]KR20160011390 (LEE BYUNG JU [KR]) [Y] 1-14; | [A]KR101694001B [A] 1-14; | [A]US2018346299 (HIGH DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 |