EP3947560 - CURABLE COMPOSITIONS, ARTICLES THEREFROM, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROPP, Michael A. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KRYGER, Matthew J. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
MAHONEY, Wayne S. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
PEREZ, Mario A. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
WU, Shuang 8 Xing Yi Road, Maxdo Centre, 38/F Shanghai 200336 / CN | 06 /
TONG, Lingjie 8 Xing Yi Road, Maxdo Centre, 38/F Shanghai 200336 / CN | 07 /
SHAABAN, Ahmad 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
JUNG, Adrian T. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
HIGGINS, Jeremy M. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
LIN, Ying 1667 Bluewater Lane Woodbury, Minnesota 55129 / US | 11 /
YAO, Li 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
KROPP, Michael A. Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
KRYGER, Matthew J. Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
MAHONEY, Wayne S. Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
PEREZ, Mario A. Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
WU, Shuang Shanghai 200336 / CN | |||
06 /
TONG, Lingjie Shanghai 200336 / CN | |||
07 /
SHAABAN, Ahmad Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
08 /
JUNG, Adrian T. Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
09 /
HIGGINS, Jeremy M. Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
10 /
LIN, Ying Woodbury, Minnesota 55129 / US | |||
11 /
YAO, Li Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19920805.9 | 25.03.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019CN79523 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020191579 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947560 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08G59/66, C08K3/36, C09J163/00, H01M8/10 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (US);
C08G59/182 (EP);
C08G59/245 (EP,US);
C08G59/66 (EP,US);
C08G59/686 (US);
C08G65/226 (EP);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K5/37 (EP,US);
C08K5/5435 (EP);
C08K5/544 (EP);
C08K5/548 (EP);
C08K7/18 (US);
C08K9/06 (EP,US);
H01M10/653 (US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/233 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K5/37, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K5/5435, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K5/544, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K5/548, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K9/06, C08L63/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, GEGENSTÄNDE DARAUS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2022/06] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITIONS, ARTICLES THEREFROM, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2022/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DURCISSABLES, ARTICLES FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 16.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0912679 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [X] 1-35* claims 1-3 *; | [X]CN103045146 (SHANGHAI KANGDA NEW MATERIALS CO LTD) [X] 1-35 * description, paragraphs [0001]-[0019] *; | [Y]CN103045146 (SHANGHAI KANGDA NEW MATERIALS CO LTD) [Y] 36-37 * description, paragraphs [0001]-[0019] *; | [Y]CN103582562 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 36-37 * paragraphs [0054]-[0075],[0137]-[0146] *; | [X]WO2018085550 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-35 * claims 1-15 *; | [X]WO2018159564 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [X] 1-35 * claims 1-12 *; | [X]CN110352219 (AJINOMOTO KK) [X] 1-35 * claims 1-16 * |