EP3944101 - INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAGI, Riho c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2024/02] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
MINAGI, Riho Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 19921112.9 | 22.03.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019JP12218 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020194403 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944101 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3944101 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/27, G06F16/23, G06F11/14 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G06F16/278 (EP,US);
G06F16/2358 (EP,US);
G06F11/1469 (EP);
G06F16/2365 (US);
G06F11/1417 (EP);
G06F11/1433 (EP);
G06F2201/80 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | G06F11/14, G06F16/23 | ||
Former IPC [2022/04] | G06F16/80, G06F11/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM, -VERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/04] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE | [2022/04] | French: | PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | Translation filed | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010161564 (LEE HUN SOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0002] , [0043] - [0073]; figure - * | International search | [A]JP2014089646 (HITACHI SOLUTIONS LTD) [A] 1-10 * , *; | [A]JP2016515271 [A] 1-10 * , *; | [A] - UEDA, Masaru et al., "The Application Design Patterns for Utilizing XMLDB", ProVISION, JP, (20081031), no. 59, pages 79 - 85, XP009530302 [A] 1-10 | by applicant | JPH0424750 | JPH0773086 | JP2003044267 |