EP3952386 - WIRELESS NODE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
KURITA, Daisuke c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
HARADA, Hiroki Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
KURITA, Daisuke Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19921721.7 | 28.03.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019JP13842 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020194733 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952386 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W16/26, H04W56/00, H04W92/20, // H04W24/02, H04W48/12, H04W84/04 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04L27/26025 (US);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H04W16/26, H04W56/00, H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKNOTEN UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATION | [2022/06] | English: | WIRELESS NODE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2022/06] | French: | NOEUD SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | Translation filed | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020034432 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [E] 1,2,4,6,8* pages 22-28 *; | [E]EP3902339 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraphs [0031] - [0051] - [0074] - [0076] * * figures 6A-7B *; | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Summary of section 7.2.3.2 - SSB extensions for IAB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190125), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1901369 SUMMARY OF SECTION 7.2.3.2 SSB EXTENSION FOR IAB, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5FAH/NR%5FAH%5F1901/Docs/R1%2D1901369%2Ezip, (20190125), XP051601301 [X] 1,5,8 * sections 1, 2.2 * [I] 2-4,6,7 | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "SSB-based discovery and measurement for IAB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190216), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1901531, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96/Docs/R1%2D1901531%2Ezip, (20190216), XP051599228 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - NTT DOCOMO; INC, "Extensions of SSBs for inter-IAB-node discovery and measurements", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #96 R1-1902794, (20190225), XP051600489 [X] 1-6 * , Section 2 * | [A] - ZTE; Sanechips, "Discussion of SSB for inter-IAB-node discovery and measurements", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #96 R1-1902197, (20190225), XP051599892 [A] 1-6 * , Section 2, 3 * |