EP3942873 - EXTENDED SIGNALING FOR MULTI-SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE (MSIM) USER-EQUIPMENT (UE) FOR NEW RADIO (NR) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Ling 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SHAHIDI, Reza 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GUO, Jiming 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Qingxin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
GHOLMIEH, Aziz 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
ZACHARIAS, Leena 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
HU, Jun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
XIE, Ling San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
SHAHIDI, Reza San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
GUO, Jiming San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Qingxin San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
GHOLMIEH, Aziz San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
06 /
ZACHARIAS, Leena San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
07 /
HU, Jun San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19921955.1 | 22.03.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019CN79273 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020191524 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942873 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/28, H04W8/18, // H04W76/27 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04W8/24 (US);
H04W76/27 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | H04W68/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | ERWEITERTE SIGNALISIERUNG FÜR MEHRTEILNEHMER-IDENTITÄTSMODUL (MSIM)-BENUTZERGERÄT (UE) FÜR NEW RADIO (NR ) | [2022/04] | English: | EXTENDED SIGNALING FOR MULTI-SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE (MSIM) USER-EQUIPMENT (UE) FOR NEW RADIO (NR) | [2022/04] | French: | SIGNALISATION ÉTENDUE POUR ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) MUNI DE PLUSIEURS MODULES D'IDENTITÉ ABONNÉ (MSIM) DANS UN SYSTÈME NEW RADIO (NR) | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016118248 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0002] - [0018] - [0057] - [0188]; figures 1-24 *; | [X]WO2017128287 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0002] - [0029] - [0046] - [0112]; figures 1-11 *; | [X]WO2018141148 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-23* paragraphs [0005] - [0041] - [0052] - [0206]; figures 1-21 * | International search | [X]WO2013001149 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-58 * description,page 7 paragraph 2 to page 8 paragraph 3 *; | [A]US2013237257 (WALKE SIMON [GB], et al) [A] 59-64,68-73 * description,paragraph 0022 *; | [A]US2015237597 (KANAMARLAPUDI SITARAMANJANEYULU [US], et al) [A] 65-66,74-75 * description,paragraph 0054 *; | [A]WO2018085145 (IDAC HOLDING INC [US]) [A] 67,76 * description,paragraphs 0087-0125 *; | [A]CN108886829 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-76 * the whole document *; | [A]CN108886683 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-76* the whole document *; | [A]TW201902251 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-76 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2016118248 | WO2017128287 | WO2018141148 |