EP3944621 - IMAGE PREDICTION METHOD, CODER, DECODER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAN, Shuai No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
HUO, Junyan No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
MA, Yanzhuo No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Wei No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
WAN, Shuai Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
02 /
HUO, Junyan Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | |||
03 /
MA, Yanzhuo Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Wei Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 19922170.6 | 12.10.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019CN110834 | Priority number, date | US201962823613P | 25.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962823613 P | [2022/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020192085 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944621 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/186, H04N19/117 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,KR);
H04N19/50 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/124 (KR);
H04N19/176 (CN,KR);
H04N19/42 (CN);
H04N19/593 (EP);
H04N19/80 (CN);
H04N19/82 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | H04N19/186 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | BILDVORHERSAGEVERFAHREN, KODIERER, DEKODIERER, UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/04] | English: | IMAGE PREDICTION METHOD, CODER, DECODER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION D'IMAGE, CODEUR, DÉCODEUR, ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2021 | Translation filed | 15.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/09] | 24.01.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.04.2024 | 12.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008048489 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al); | [XI]EP2046052 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]WO2013160696 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [XI]EP2753078 (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]); |