EP3936894 - DISTANCE MEASUREMENT METHOD, RADAR AND VEHICLE-BORNE RADAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Honglei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Qiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
JIANG, Tong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WU, Hongying Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
LI, Honglei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Qiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
JIANG, Tong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
WU, Hongying Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19922323.1 | 04.04.2019 | [2022/02] | WO2019CN81519 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020199199 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936894 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/08, G01S7/4863, G01S17/931 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G01S7/4863 (EP,US);
G01S17/08 (EP);
G01S17/10 (US);
G01S17/931 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G01S17/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | ABSTANDSMESSVERFAHREN, RADAR UND FAHRZEUGSEITIGES RADAR | [2022/02] | English: | DISTANCE MEASUREMENT METHOD, RADAR AND VEHICLE-BORNE RADAR | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE DISTANCE, RADAR ET RADAR EMBARQUÉ DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2021 | Translation filed | 05.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016074724 (TERRE WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0029] , [ 157] , [ 158]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2018338127 (WANG YIBING MICHELLE [US], et al) [A] 1,4,13,14* paragraphs [0032] , [0 47] , [0 66]; figure 2 *; | [XI] - YOSHIOKA KENTARO ET AL, "A 20-ch TDC/ADC Hybrid Architecture LiDAR SoC for 240 $\times$ 96 Pixel 200-m Range Imaging With Smart Accumulation Technique and Residue Quantizing SAR ADC", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE, USA, vol. 53, no. 11, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2018.2868315, ISSN 0018-9200, (20181101), pages 3026 - 3038, (20181030), XP011693751 [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,14 * title; page 3028, column 1; page 3028, column 2; page 3029, column 1; page 3033, column 1;; figures 3, 4, 7, 8(a), 8(b), 9, 24(c) * [I] 3,6-8,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2018.2868315 | [A] - NICLASS CRISTIANO ET AL, "A 0.18-$\mu$ m CMOS SoC for a 100-m-Range 10-Frame/s 200 $\,\times\,$96-Pixel Time-of-Flight Depth Sensor", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE, USA, vol. 49, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2013.2284352, ISSN 0018-9200, (20140101), pages 315 - 330, (20131220), XP011534932 [A] 1,3,14 * title; page 317, column 1 - page 319, column 1; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2013.2284352 | International search | [A]CN1487308 (BEIJING INST TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [A] 1-25 * description, pp. 3 and 4 *; | [A]CN104024878 (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN103616696 (CN ELECT TECH NO 38 RES INST) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN105891841 (UNIV WUHAN SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]WO2005008271 (MUNRO JAMES F [US]) [A] 1-25 * entire document * |