EP3948357 - SEMICONDUCTOR X-RAY DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. B507, Block A and B Nanshan Medical Device Industrial Park Nanhai Avenue 1019 Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/14] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd. Suite 201, Building B52 Tanglang Industrial Area No. 13 at No. Five Xinyi Road Tanglang Community, Taoyuan Str., Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518071 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Peiyan Room 201, Block A, No. 1, Qianwan Road 1 Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District Shenzhen Guangdong 518054 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yurun Room 201, Block A, No. 1, Qianwan Road 1 Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District Shenzhen Guangdong 518054 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
CAO, Peiyan Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District Shenzhen Guangdong 518054 / CN | ||
02 /
LIU, Yurun Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District Shenzhen Guangdong 518054 / CN | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19922775.2 | 29.03.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019CN80407 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198934 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948357 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/24, G01T1/16, G01N23/083 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H01L27/14661 (EP);
G01T1/246 (US);
G01T1/241 (US);
G01T1/244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERRÖNTGENDETEKTOR | [2022/06] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR X-RAY DETECTOR | [2022/06] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONS X À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6392217 (TERANUMA OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * column 16, lines 12-18, 37 - column 17, line 45; figures 5b,6b,7b,8b * [A] 3; | [XYI]CN108271415 (SHENZHEN XPECTVISION TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0073] - [0081]; figures 1-11 * [Y] 4 [I] 3; | [XYI]WO2019019054 (SHENZHEN XPECTVISION TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * paragraphs [0071] , [0108] - [0116]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 4[I] 3 | International search | [Y]US6392217 (TERANUMA OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-31 * description, column 16, line 55 to column 17, line 30, figure 7 *; | [A]CN102135626 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A]US8053722 (ASGHARI MEHDI [US], et al) [A] 1-31* the whole document *; | [A]CN107533146 (SHENZHEN XPECTVISION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN108271415 (SHENZHEN XPECTVISION TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-31 * claims 1-37, description, paragraphs [0063]-[0103], figures 1-18 *; | [A]CN109346488 (UNIV SUN YAT SEN) [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN108271425 | WO2019019054 |