EP3951099 - HYDRAULIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment AB 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Taerang 101-602, 94, Yangju-ro Yangsan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 50634 / KR | 02 /
GWON, Sangmin 104-203, 156, Oedongballim-ro, Uichang-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 51438 / KR | 03 /
BAE, Sangki 17-201, 106, Sinsa-ro, Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 51449 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
JUNG, Taerang Yangsan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 50634 / KR | ||
02 /
GWON, Sangmin Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 51438 / KR | |||
03 /
BAE, Sangki Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 51449 / KR | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19922961.8 | 05.04.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019KR04084 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020204235 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951099 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/22, E02F9/20, E02F3/43, F15B1/02, F15B1/033, F15B21/047, F15B21/14 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
E02F9/2217 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2221 (KR);
F15B1/04 (US);
E02F9/2075 (KR);
E02F9/2267 (KR);
E02F9/2271 (KR);
E02F9/2285 (EP);
E02F9/2292 (EP);
F15B1/024 (EP);
F15B21/047 (EP);
F15B21/14 (EP,US);
E02F3/435 (EP);
F15B1/033 (EP);
F15B2211/6306 (EP);
F15B2211/6346 (EP);
F15B2211/6658 (EP);
F15B2211/7053 (EP);
F15B2211/7058 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | E02F9/22, E02F9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE MASCHINE | [2022/06] | English: | HYDRAULIC MACHINE | [2022/06] | French: | MACHINE HYDRAULIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2021 | Translation filed | 05.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 15.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2770219 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10-12 * paragraph [0058]; figure 2 * [Y] 4,9; | [Y]WO2016169943 (CATERPILLAR SARL [CH]) [Y] 4,9* paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2011075082 (KYB CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0039] and figure 3. *; | [XYA]KR20150110597 (CATERPILLAR SARL [CH]) [X] 1-3, 8-11 * See paragraphs [002 11, [0030], [0053]-[0062] and figures 7-8. * [Y] 12 [A] 4-7; | [Y]JP2016205492 (CATERPILLAR SARL) [Y] 12 * See paragraph [0046] and figure 1. *; | [A]KR101891376B (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-12* See claim 1. *; | [A]JP2019031989 (KOBELCO CONTSTRUCTION MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1-12 * See paragraph [0030] and figure 3. * |