EP3951801 - CONDUCTIVE METAL PASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nisshinbo Holdings Inc. 2-31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyo-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8650 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA Gen c/o Nisshinbo Holdings Inc., 1-2-3, Onodai, Midori-ku Chiba-city, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MASUDA Gen Chiba-city, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19923063.2 | 29.03.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019JP14091 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020202280 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951801 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/22, C08K5/19, C08K5/50, C07F9/54 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
C08K5/19 (EP);
C08K5/50 (EP);
C09D5/24 (US);
C07F9/5407 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H01B1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGE METALLPASTE | [2022/06] | English: | CONDUCTIVE METAL PASTE | [2022/06] | French: | PÂTE MÉTALLIQUE CONDUCTRICE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | Translation filed | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0309622 (TAKEMOTO OIL & FAT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * claims 1-10; tables 1-5C *; | [X]JP2006335995 (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035]; examples 1-8; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US2007181856 (PARK JONG-JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-9 * examples 3-4; claims 1-28 *; | [X]WO2017090346 (NAT UNIV CORP TOTTORI UNIV [JP], et al) [X] 7 * claims 1-12; table 1 *; | [X]EP3447059 (NISSHINBO HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [X] 7* examples 1-2; claims 1-12 * | International search | [A]JP2017073365 (ALPHA CORP, et al) [A] 4-6, 9* , *; | [XA]WO2017183342 (NISSHINBO HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [X] 7 * , [0011] - [0039] & EP 3447059 A1 [0011]-[0039] & US 2019/0127403 A1 & JP 2017-193510 A & CN 109071570 A & KR 10-2018-0136947 A * [A] 4-6, 9; | [XA]JP2018035286 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [X] 1-3, 8 * , * [A] 4-6, 9 | by applicant | WO02076924 | WO2013005712 | JP2014114420 | WO2016103906 | JP2017036234 |