EP3949895 - CUSTOM IMPLANT FIXTURE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND CUSTOM IMPLANT SYSTEM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentium Co., Ltd. Jagok-dong, Gangnam Ace Tower, 821-ho 174-10, Jagok-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06373 / KR | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Sung Min 76, Changnyong-daero 256beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16229 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Ki Sun Dogok-dong, Samsung Raemian Apt.)108-dong 593-ho 2803, Nambusunhwan-ro, Gangnam-gu Seoul 06277 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Sang Wan Jung-dong, Seongsanmaeul Namkwang housetory) 109- dong, 301-ho, 62, Dongbaek 5-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17005 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
CHUNG, Sung Min Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16229 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Ki Sun Seoul 06277 / KR | |||
03 /
SHIN, Sang Wan Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17005 / KR | Representative(s) | von Bülow & Tamada Rotbuchenstraße 6 81547 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19923359.4 | 30.10.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019KR14473 | Priority number, date | KR20190036667 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190036667 | [2022/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020204294 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3949895 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61C13/00, A61C9/00, A61B34/10 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61C8/0045 (EP);
A61C8/0022 (KR,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/10 (EP,KR);
A61B6/51 (US);
A61C1/084 (EP);
A61C13/0019 (KR,US);
A61C8/0025 (EP);
A61C8/0036 (EP,KR,US);
A61C8/0037 (US);
A61C9/0046 (KR);
G06T17/00 (US);
G06T19/20 (US);
G16H50/50 (US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,KR);
A61B2034/108 (EP,KR);
A61C2008/0046 (KR,US);
G06T2210/41 (US);
G06T2219/2008 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | MASSGESCHNEIDERTE IMPLANTATVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND INDIVIDUELL ANGEPASSTES IMPLANTATSYSTEM DAMIT | [2022/06] | English: | CUSTOM IMPLANT FIXTURE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND CUSTOM IMPLANT SYSTEM USING SAME | [2022/06] | French: | CORPS D'IMPLANT PERSONNALISÉ, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET SYSTÈME D'IMPLANT PERSONNALISÉ L'UTILISANT | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2021 | Translation filed | 29.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2313540 (SCHAPPERT DOUGLAS ALAN [CA]); | [XY]US6099313 (DOERKEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010203478 (RUBBERT RUEDGER [DE]); | [Y]US2015025855 (FISKER RUNE [DK], et al) | International search | [A]JP4443934B ; | [XY]KR101175822B ; | [Y]KR20140113971 (3SHAPE A [DK]); | [A]KR101554158B (DIO CORP [KR]); | [X]KR20180135620 (CATHOLIC UNIV KOREA IND ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR]) | by applicant | WO2007038817 | WO2017007248 |