EP3955481 - SCRAMBLING PROCESSING METHOD, DESCRAMBLING PROCESSING METHOD, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yuanyuan No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19924215.7 | 12.04.2019 | [2022/07] | WO2019CN82461 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206682 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955481 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04W72/12, H04J11/00, H04L25/03, H04W4/06, H04W4/44 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04W4/44 (EP,CN);
H04W72/30 (US);
H04J11/0023 (EP);
H04L25/03866 (EP);
H04W28/06 (CN);
H04W72/0466 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W76/14 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/40 (EP);
H04W76/11 (EP);
H04W76/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERSCHLÜSSELUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/07] | English: | SCRAMBLING PROCESSING METHOD, DESCRAMBLING PROCESSING METHOD, AND DEVICE | [2022/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'EMBROUILLAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DÉSEMBROUILLAGE ET DISPOSITIF | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2021 | Translation filed | 09.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3079294 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0007]; figure 4 *; | [XI] - ERICSSON, "On Scrambling of D2D Physical Channels", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-140777 SCRAMBLING OF D2D CHANNELS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20140209), XP050736278 [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 3 * [I] 4,8,9,11,13 | [XI] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Support of unicast, groupcast and broadcast", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1809156_SUPPORT UNI GROUP BROADCAST_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94/Docs/R1%2D1809156%2Ezip, (20180810), XP051516526 [X] 1,5,6 * page 3 - page 4 * [I] 4,8,11-13 | [XI] - CAICT, "Considerations on Scrambling Issue for NR V2X Unicast Sidelink", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190215), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1902923, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96/Docs/R1%2D1902923%2Ezip, (20190215), XP051600621 [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 1, paragraph 2.1 * [I] 8,10,12,13 | International search | [A]US2012207145 (HAN JIN KYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]CN104038920 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [X]WO2015109461 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-18 * description, page 14, line 14 - page 42, line 11, and figures 1-10 *; | [A]CN105376770 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [X]CN107154833 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 118-257, and figures 1-12 * |