EP3957751 - SHORT RNA-PRIMED XENO SENSOR MODULE AMPLIFICATION-BASED SHORT RNA DETECTION TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xenohelix Co., Ltd 202ho,152 Anjeon-ro, Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si, Jeollabuk-do 54871 / KR | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Seong Wook 257-506, 1218, Yangjae-daero Songpa-gu Seoul 05649 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Seok Keun 2402-1104, Hatbitmauel 24danji Apartment, 106, Hwasin-ro, Deogyang-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 10492 / KR | 03 /
SHAH, Pratik A601, Yonsei University Avison House, 50, Yonsei- ro Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03722 / KR | 04 /
NAGDA, Riddhi Nitin A601, Yonsei University Avison House, 50, Yonsei- ro Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03722 / KR | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19924846.9 | 04.11.2019 | [2022/08] | WO2019KR14837 | Priority number, date | KR20190046388 | 19.04.2019 Original published format: KR 20190046388 | KR20190090404 | 25.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190090404 | [2022/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020213800 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957751 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6825 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6825 (EP);
C12Q1/6876 (KR,US);
C12Q1/686 (KR,US);
C12Q2521/301 (US);
C12Q2525/113 (KR,US);
C12Q2525/121 (US);
C12Q2525/179 (US);
C12Q2525/185 (US);
C12Q2525/204 (KR);
C12Q2525/207 (US);
C12Q2531/113 (KR);
C12Q2537/149 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/207, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2563/107, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | C12Q1/6876, C12Q1/686 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | AUF DURCH KURZ-RNA-GEPRIMTE XENONSENSORMODULAMPLIFIKATION BASIERENDE KURZ-RNA-DETEKTIONSTECHNIK | [2022/08] | English: | SHORT RNA-PRIMED XENO SENSOR MODULE AMPLIFICATION-BASED SHORT RNA DETECTION TECHNIQUE | [2022/08] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE DÉTECTION D'ARN COURT BASÉE SUR L'AMPLIFICATION D'UN MODULE DE CAPTEUR XENO AMORCÉE PAR UN ARN COURT | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2020 | Translation filed | 13.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6001611 (WILL STEPHEN GORDON [US]) [Y] 2,11 * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 15 * * column 12, line 54 - line 63 *; | [XYI]WO2017141067 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,10,12 * figure 18 * [Y] 2,11 [I] 7-9; | [A]CN108048537 (UNIV CHINA THREE GORGES CTGU) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 ** example 1 *; | [XYI]WO2019033831 (JIANGSU MICRODIAG BIOMEDICINE TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,6,10,12 * figure 2 * [Y] 2,11 [I] 7-9; | [XYI] - HONGXIA JIA ET AL, "Ultrasensitive Detection of microRNAs by Exponential Isothermal Amplification", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE, HOBOKEN, USA, (20100702), vol. 49, no. 32, doi:10.1002/ANIE.201001375, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 5498 - 5501, XP072076898 [X] 1,2,6,10,12 * figure 1 * [Y] 2,11 [I] 7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201001375 | International search | [XY]US2007077582 (SLEPNEV VLADIMIR I [US]) [X] 1, 6-10, 12 * See paragraphs [0071]-[0072]; claims 1, 3-4, 17-19; figure 1. * [Y] 2-5, 11, 13-20; | [Y]KR20120097793 (BIONEER CORP [KR]) [Y] 2-5, 11, 13-20 * See paragraphs [0016], [0020]. *; | [X]US2014221228 (GINSBERG STEPHEN D [US], et al) [X] 1, 6-10, 12 * See paragraphs [0017], [0064]; claim 1; figure 1. *; | [A]WO2016134258 (IBIS BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-20* See the entire document. *; | [Y] - KALOTA, A. et al., "2'-deoxy-2'-fluoro-beta-D-arabinonucleic acid (2'F-ANA) modified oligonucleotides (ON) effect highly efficient, and persistent , gene silencing", Nucleic Acids Research, (20060000), vol. 34, no. 2, doi:10.1093/NAR/GKJ455, pages 451 - 461, XP002518575 [Y] 2-5, 13-20 * See abstract; page 452. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKJ455 |