EP3958624 - USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIOKA, Shohei c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
MURAYAMA, Daisuke c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 19924889.9 | 18.04.2019 | [2022/08] | WO2019JP16640 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020213126 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958624 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H04W72/04 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
H04W64/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/08] | English: | USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2022/08] | French: | TERMINAL UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2021 | Translation filed | 04.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 23.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2014034573 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [Y] 2 * , paragraph [0094] & US 2015/0173029 A1, paragraph [0116] *; | [XY]WO2016060177 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1, 3, 5, 6 * , paragraphs [0027]-[0043] & US 2017/0244501 A1, claim 1 * [Y] 2, 4; | [Y] - VIVO, "Discussion on DL and UL RS for NR positioning", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #96b R1- 1904107, (20190408), XP051693338 [Y] 4 * , section 2.1 * |