EP3959600 - AUTOMATIC DISCOVERY AND CONFIGURATION OF IOT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARUMUGAM, Senthamiz Selvi No 7, Nallana Mudali Street Royapettah Chennai 600014 / IN | 02 /
U, Venkatesh 30/83 Balaji Nagar Main Road Kolathur Chennai 600099 / IN | 03 /
MUJUMDAR, Anusha Pradeep 9/7, Vijaysree Apartments, 9/1, Lewis Road, Cooke Town Bangalore 560005 / IN | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 19926242.9 | 25.04.2019 | [2022/09] | WO2019IN50332 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020217246 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959600 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3959600 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, G06F8/61 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G06F8/61 (EP);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L12/2809 (EP);
H04L12/2829 (EP);
H04L67/125 (US);
H04L67/306 (US);
G16Y40/35 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | G06F8/61, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ENTDECKUNG UND KONFIGURATION VON IOT-VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/09] | English: | AUTOMATIC DISCOVERY AND CONFIGURATION OF IOT DEVICES | [2022/09] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE ET CONFIGURATION AUTOMATIQUES DE DISPOSITIFS IOT | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 19.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016308987 (KAN TAI-WEI [TW], et al); | [XI]US2018034656 (BALASUBRAMANIAN SWAMINATHAN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2015019342 (GUPTA BINITA [US]); | [Y]US2017220940 (SHAASHUA TRIINU MAGI [US], et al); | [Y]US9900171 (GUEDALIA ISAAC DAVID [IL], et al); | [Y]US10270881 (GEORGE WILLIAM BRANDON [US], et al) | by applicant | US2016308987 | US2018034656 |