EP3938867 - SPATIAL AUDIO AND HAPTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHARITKAR, Sunil Ganpatrao 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 02 /
BALLAGAS, Rafael Antonio 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 03 /
SMATHERS, Kevin Lee 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 04 /
GHOSH, Sarthak 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 05 /
ATHREYA, Madhu Sudan 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
BHARITKAR, Sunil Ganpatrao Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | ||
02 /
BALLAGAS, Rafael Antonio Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | |||
03 /
SMATHERS, Kevin Lee Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | |||
04 /
GHOSH, Sarthak Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | |||
05 /
ATHREYA, Madhu Sudan Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | Representative(s) | Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Bryers LLP Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19926336.9 | 26.04.2019 | [2022/03] | WO2019US29390 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219073 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938867 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/16, G10L21/16, H04N21/2343, // G08B6/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
H04N21/23418 (EP);
H04N21/23614 (EP);
H04N21/4394 (EP);
H04N21/8106 (EP);
H04N21/84 (EP);
H04N21/8456 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | G06F3/01, G08B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | RÄUMLICHES AUDIO UND HAPTIK | [2022/03] | English: | SPATIAL AUDIO AND HAPTICS | [2022/03] | French: | AUDIO SPATIAL ET HAPTIQUES | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 25.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2775377 (IMMERSION CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0021] - [0022] - [0041] - [0048] - [0054] - [0060]; figures 2,4,6 *; | [I]EP2806353 (IMMERSION CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0040] - [0042] - [0051] , [0064] - [0068]; figures 1,6 *; | [A]EP2846229 (IMMERSION CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,8,9,11,14,15* paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0053] - [0058]; figure 6 * | International search | [Y]WO2016174659 (SNAPAID LTD [IL]) [Y] 5, 6 * , p. 4, lines 23-32 *; | [Y]US2017177085 (SUN TIMOTHY CHIA-CHIEH [US], et al) [Y] 2-4, 7-9, 11, 12, 14, 15 * , paragraphs [0021], [0094]-[0097] *; | [Y]WO2018002427 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [Y] 1-15 * , p. 1, line 20 - p. 2, line 3 *; | [A]EP3343326 (IMMERSION CORP [US])[A] 1-15; | [Y]US2018227063 (HEUBEL ROBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0018], [0032], [0034], [0071], [0097] * |