EP3965480 - METHOD FOR LIMITING UPLINK TRANSMISSION POWER RADIATION AND RELATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Rongyi NO.18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 19926802.0 | 30.04.2019 | [2022/10] | WO2019CN85391 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020220364 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965480 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/14, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W52/38 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H04W52/367 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/3838 (US);
H04W52/34 (EP,KR);
H04W52/38 (EP);
H04W88/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04W52/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEGRENZUNG VON UPLINK-SENDELEISTUNGSSTRAHLUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES PRODUKT | [2022/10] | English: | METHOD FOR LIMITING UPLINK TRANSMISSION POWER RADIATION AND RELATED PRODUCT | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LIMITATION DU RAYONNEMENT DE PUISSANCE DE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE ET PRODUIT ASSOCIÉ | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | Translation filed | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 17.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "SAR mitigation for PC2 FDD-TDD EN-DC in FR1", vol. RAN WG4, no. Xi'an, CN; 20190408 - 20190412, (20190401), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1904619, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG4%5FRadio/TSGR4%5F90Bis/Docs/R4%2D1904619%2Ezip, (20190401), XP051714950 [X] 1,9,10,12 * section 1 * * section 2 * * section 2.3 * [A] 2-6,8,11,13-15 [I] 7 | [XAI] - OPPO, "Discussion on HPUE for inter-band EN-DC", vol. RAN WG4, no. Athens, GR; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190215), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1901321 DISCUSSION ON HPUE FOR INTER-BAND EN-DC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG4%5FRadio/TSGR4%5F90/Docs/R4%2D1901321%2Ezip, (20190215), XP051605930 [X] 1,2,12,13 * section 1 * * section 2 * [A] 3-6,8,11,14,15 [I] 7,9,10 | [XAI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Power class 2 UE for TDD-TDD EN-DC", vol. RAN WG4, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190215), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1900532, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG4%5FRadio/TSGR4%5F90/Docs/R4%2D1900532%2Ezip, (20190215), XP051605289 [X] 1,2,12,13 * section 2 * * section 2.1 * * section 2.4 * [A] 3-6,8,11,14,15 [I] 7,9,10 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; User Equipment (UE) radio transmission and reception; Part 3: Range 1 and Range 2 Interworking operation with other radios (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.101-3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20190404), vol. RAN WG4, no. V15.5.0, pages 1 - 224, XP051723306 [A] 1-15 * sectin 6.2B.3.1.0 * | International search | [A]US2015327280 (ZHANG YUJIAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN105164938 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M)[A] 1-20; | [A]US2016112913 (MALKAMÄKI ESA MIKAEL [FI], et al) [A] 1-20; | [X]CN109587779 (CHINA UNICOM) [X] 1, 9, 10- 12, 16, 18-20; | [A]CN109586943 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN109587704 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 |