EP3944382 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, POSITIVE ELECTRODE PLATE, BATTERY, AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/04] | POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, POSITIVE ELECTRODE PLATE, BATTERY, AND DEVICE | ||
[2024/28] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Chengdu No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Huafeng No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Qisen No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
LIANG, Chengdu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
HUANG, Huafeng Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
HUANG, Qisen Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 19927079.4 | 12.12.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019CN124825 | Priority number, date | CN201910351364 | 28.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910351364 | [2022/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020220685 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944382 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, // H01M10/0525 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN);
H01M4/134 (CN,US);
H01M4/668 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | H01M4/64, H01M10/0525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENSTROMKOLLEKTOR, POSITIVELEKTRODENPLATTE, BATTERIE UND GERÄT | [2024/28] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, POSITIVE ELECTRODE PLATE, BATTERY, AND APPARATUS | [2024/28] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, ÉLECTRODE PLANE POSITIVE, BATTERIE ET APPAREIL | [2024/28] |
Former [2022/04] | POSITIVELEKTRODENSTROMKOLLEKTOR, POSITIVELEKTRODENPLATTE, BATTERIE UND VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2022/04] | POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, POSITIVE ELECTRODE PLATE, BATTERY, AND DEVICE | ||
Former [2022/04] | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, ÉLECTRODE PLANE POSITIVE, BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | Translation filed | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004126663 (SUDANO ANTHONY [CA], et al); | [X]CN107123812 (ANHUI ZHONGZHI JINGU ENERGY TECH CO LTD); | [X]EP3367485 (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) |