EP3967390 - TREATMENT METHOD FOR FLUID TO BE TREATED SUPPLIED TO ZEOLITE MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui E&S Co., Ltd. 6-4, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-8439 / JP | [2024/22] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Mitsui E&S Machinery Co., Ltd. 6-4, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8439 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEKAWA Kazuya c/o Mitsui E&S Machinery Co., Ltd., 6-4, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8439 / JP | [2022/36] |
Former [2022/11] | 01 /
MAEKAWA Kazuya c/o Mitsui E&S Machinery Co., Ltd., 6-4, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8439 / JP | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 19927589.2 | 29.07.2019 | [2022/11] | WO2019JP29591 | Priority number, date | JP20190089007 | 09.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019089007 | [2022/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225931 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967390 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, B01D61/16, B01D61/36, B01D15/12, B01D53/22 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B01D71/0281 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/228 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/50 (US);
B01D53/72 (US);
B01D61/04 (KR);
B01D61/16 (KR);
B01D61/362 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/363 (EP,KR);
B01D65/02 (KR);
B01D65/08 (KR);
C02F1/448 (KR);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2311/04 (EP,KR);
B01D2311/12 (EP,KR);
B01D2311/2626 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | B01D71/02, B01D61/16, B01D61/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ZU BEHANDELNDE FLÜSSIGKEIT, DIE EINER ZEOLITHMEMBRAN ZUGEFÜHRT WIRD | [2022/11] | English: | TREATMENT METHOD FOR FLUID TO BE TREATED SUPPLIED TO ZEOLITE MEMBRANE | [2022/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE FLUIDE À TRAITER FOURNISSANT UNE MEMBRANE DE ZÉOLITE | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2021 | Translation filed | 14.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007053811 (TSOTSIS THEODORE T [US], et al); | [Y]US2007167530 (GERLACH TILL [DE], et al); | [Y]US2014213830 (SASAKI HIDEO [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]JP2007515448 ; | [Y]JP2012035163 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG); | [Y]WO2013035849 (TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2016203078 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG) | by applicant | JP2012035163 |