EP3907364 - ANTI-DEFORMATION HINGE HAVING PRE-TIGHTENING ADJUSTMENT FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingyuan Saca Precision Manufacturing Co., Ltd. No. 15 Jiashun Road Jiafu Industrial Zone, Yinzhan, Qingcheng District Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Gengxi No. 15 Jiashun Road Jiafu Industrial Zone, Yinzhan, Qingcheng District Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | 02 /
WU, Yitai No. 15 Jiashun Road Jiafu Industrial Zone, Yinzhan, Qingcheng District Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Wengen No. 15 Jiashun Road Jiafu Industrial Zone, Yinzhan, Qingcheng District Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | 04 /
CHE, Xiaoqiang No. 15 Jiashun Road Jiafu Industrial Zone, Yinzhan, Qingcheng District Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
CAI, Gengxi Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | ||
02 /
WU, Yitai Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHU, Wengen Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | |||
04 /
CHE, Xiaoqiang Qingyuan, Guangdong 511500 / CN | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Kurig, Thomas Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19927796.3 | 25.07.2019 | [2021/45] | WO2019CN97777 | Priority number, date | CN201910377431 | 04.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910377431 | [2021/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020224061 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907364 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05D3/02, E05D5/06, E05D7/04 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
E05D7/0415 (EP);
E05D5/00 (CN);
E05D7/0407 (EP,US);
E05D3/02 (EP);
E05D5/0276 (US);
E05D5/065 (EP,US);
E05D7/0009 (CN);
E05D7/04 (EP);
E05D2007/0461 (EP);
E05D2007/0469 (EP);
E05D2007/0476 (EP);
E05D2007/0484 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | E05D7/00, E05D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | VERFORMUNGSSCHUTZSCHARNIER MIT VORSPANNENDER JUSTIERFUNKTION | [2021/45] | English: | ANTI-DEFORMATION HINGE HAVING PRE-TIGHTENING ADJUSTMENT FUNCTION | [2021/45] | French: | CHARNIÈRE ANTI-DÉFORMATION AYANT UNE FONCTION D'AJUSTEMENT DE PRÉ-SERRAGE | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | Translation filed | 05.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT341905B (BLUM GMBH [AT]) [X] 1* figure - *; | [X]US2004163211 (RUCKER MARCO [AT]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0037]; figures 6-9 *; | [X]CN104989204 (WU ZHIYONG) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0029]; figure 5 *; | [XA]US9328545 (NG TAI WAI [CN]) [X] 1,6,9,10 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 67; figures 1-9 * [A] 2-5,7,8 | International search | [A]KR20050110432 (SAMWOO CORP [KR]) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN101858174 (ZHIYONG WU) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]DE202013100261U (CHENG FENG [CN]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN204645918U (GUANGDONG TAIMING METAL PRODUCTS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0027]-[0034], figures 1-11 *; | [PX]CN110029900 (QINGYUAN XINGHUI PREC MANUFACTURING CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * |