Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
04.01.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.12.2023 | First examination report | |
04.09.2023 | Change - representative | |
01.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.07.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
22.07.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
23.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.03.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 | Change - classification | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 | Change - classification | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.02.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
18.02.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
25.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.11.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.11.2021 | Change - representative | |
09.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.11.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.11.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |