Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020230291 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP19306 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11994311 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2024 | B2 | US2022221181 | 14.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP19306 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7109663B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2022 | B2 | JPWO2020230291 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP19306 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113874847B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2024 | B | CN113874847 | 31.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP19306 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3971723 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2022 | A4 | EP3971723 | 23.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP19306 | 15.05.2019 |