EP3841827 - BIDIRECTIONAL SIDELINK RADIO LINK CONTROL BEARERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Fangli 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | 02 /
WU, Zhibin One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
VENKATARAMAN, Vijay One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Dawei One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
CHEN, Yuqin 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | 06 /
HU, Haijing 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | 07 /
LOVLEKAR, Srirang A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
GURUMOORTHY, Sethuraman One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 09 /
SHIKARI, Murtaza A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 10 /
KODALI, Sree Ram One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 11 /
XING, Longda One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 12 /
NIMMALA, Srinivasan One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 13 /
RODGERS, Clive E. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 14 /
HE, Hong One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/26] | 01 /
XU, Fangli 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | ||
02 /
WU, Zhibin One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
VENKATARAMAN, Vijay One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Dawei One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
05 /
CHEN, Yuqin 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | |||
06 /
HU, Haijing 25F International Finance Centre 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | |||
07 /
LOVLEKAR, Srirang, A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
08 /
GURUMOORTHY, Sethuraman One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
09 /
SHIKARI, Murtaza, A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
10 /
KODALI, Sree Ram One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
11 /
XING, Longda One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
12 /
NIMMALA, Srinivasan One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
13 /
RODGERS, Clive, E. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
14 /
HE, Hong One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19929191.5 | 04.11.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019CN115315 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021087660 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841827 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3841827 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/1829, H04L1/1867, H04L5/00, H04W76/14, // H04W76/11 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04L1/1851 (EP);
H04L1/1883 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | H04W76/14, H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/26] | H04W76/10, H04W76/23 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALE SIDELINK-FUNKVERBINDUNGSSTEUERUNGSTRÄGER | [2021/26] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL SIDELINK RADIO LINK CONTROL BEARERS | [2021/26] | French: | SUPPORTS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON RADIO DE LIAISON LATÉRALE BIDIRECTIONNELS | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3742832 (ASUSTEK COMP INC [TW]); |