EP3977507 - INCORPORATING SEMICONDUCTORS ON A POLYCRYSTALLINE DIAMOND SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas State University JCK Bldg. Suite 489 601 University Drive San Marcos, Texas 78666 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMED, Raju Texas State University, Roy F. Mitte Complex 3205 601 University Drive San Marcos, TX 78666 / US | 02 /
PINER, Edwin, L. Texas State University, Roy F. Mitte Complex 3240 749 N. Comanche St. San Marcos, TX 78666 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 19930465.0 | 31.05.2019 | [2022/14] | WO2019US34938 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020242494 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977507 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/335, H01L29/778 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H01L21/02488 (EP,US);
H01L21/4803 (US);
C23C16/27 (US);
C23C16/345 (US);
C23C16/50 (US);
C23C16/56 (US);
C30B25/183 (US);
C30B25/186 (US);
C30B29/04 (US);
C30B29/406 (US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02433 (EP);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/02505 (EP);
H01L21/02527 (EP);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP);
H01L21/02639 (EP);
H01L21/02642 (EP);
H01L21/02647 (EP,US);
H01L21/7806 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | H01L21/02, H01L21/20, H01L21/335, H01L29/778 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | AUFNAHME VON HALBLEITERN AUF EIN SUBSTRAT AUS POLYKRISTALLINEM DIAMANT | [2022/14] | English: | INCORPORATING SEMICONDUCTORS ON A POLYCRYSTALLINE DIAMOND SUBSTRATE | [2022/14] | French: | INCORPORATION DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS SUR UN SUBSTRAT EN DIAMANT POLYCRISTALLIN | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/15] | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009065788 (BASKARAN RAJASHREE [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0012]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2010327228 (BANDO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0040] - [0049] - [0061]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US5204210 (JANSEN FRANK [US], et al) [Y] 11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2009065788 (BASKARAN RAJASHREE [US], et al) [Y] 11 * entire document *; | [A]US2013183798 (FRANCIS DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-17* entire document *; | [A]US2014141595 (BABIC DUBRAVKO [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A] - DUMKA et al., "A IGaN/GaN HEMTs on diamond substrate with over 7 W/mm output power density at 10 GHz", Electronics Letters, (20130926), vol. 49, no. 20, doi:10.1049/el.2013.1973, pages 1298 - 1299, XP006044781 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el.2013.1973 |