EP3981559 - TACTILE SENSOR, ROBOT HAND, AND ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NABETO, Misato c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
DOI, Sayaka c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
KOGA, Hiroki c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 19931593.8 | 06.06.2019 | [2022/15] | WO2019JP22640 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020246009 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981559 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/02, B25J15/08, B25J13/08 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B25J13/082 (EP);
B25J19/02 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/15] | B25J19/02, B25J15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | TAKTILER SENSOR, ROBOTERHAND UND ROBOTER | [2022/15] | English: | TACTILE SENSOR, ROBOT HAND, AND ROBOT | [2022/15] | French: | CAPTEUR TACTILE, MAIN DE ROBOT ET ROBOT | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | Translation filed | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 21.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS537071 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPS60221287 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JP2002365122 (HAYASHI EIJI, et al); | [X]WO2018079771 (LIFE ROBOTICS INC [JP]); | [XI]US2018313705 (KAMIYA TOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [X]WO2018235214 (SAITO INVENTIVE CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]WO2013031007 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2016211950 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2018072185 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XY]WO2019031502 (THK CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2016205942 |