EP3980438 - NOVEL ESTERS OF MEDROXYPROGESTERONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hafeez, Kalak Abdul No.8 Regency Palazzo, A 4, 4th Floor Hall Road Richards Park, Richards Town Bengaluru, Karnataka 560005 / IN | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITTALA, Sandhya Hyderabad 500037 / IN | 02 /
HAFEEZ, Kalak Abdul Bengaluru Karnataka 560005 / IN | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 19931866.8 | 18.07.2019 | [2022/15] | WO2019IB56136 | Priority number, date | IN201941022324 | 05.06.2019 Original published format: IN201941022324 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020245641 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980438 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07J75/00, C07J7/00, A61P5/34, A61P15/18 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C07J7/0045 (EP);
C07J1/0033 (US);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P5/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/15] | C07J75/00, C07J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | NEUE ESTER VON MEDROXYPROGESTERON | [2022/15] | English: | NOVEL ESTERS OF MEDROXYPROGESTERONE | [2022/15] | French: | NOUVEAUX ESTERS DE MÉDROXYPROGESTÉRONE | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 28.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2024 | 31.07.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2963498 (BERGSTROM CLARENCE G, et al) [I] 1-10 * example 4 ** column 2, paragraphs 3,4 *; | [I]DE1097986 (SYNTEX SA) [I] 1-10 * example 1 * * column 6, lines 40-65; table 1 * * column 1, paragraph 1 *; | [I] - ANNEN K ET AL, "17-PIVALATE IN DER PREGNANREIHE//17-PIVALATE DERIVATIVES OF PREGNANE", LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH. WEINHEIM, DE, (19830101), vol. 4, ISSN 0170-2041, pages 705 - 711, XP001119196 [I] 1-10 * page 706; compound 8 * * page 707, paragraph 4; table 1 * | International search | [A]AT158148B (CHEM IND BASEL) [A] 1-9* Claims, Examples *; | [Y]US3377364 (SPERO GEORGE B) [Y] 1-9 * Claims, Examples *; | [Y]US4038389 (LAMB DONALD J) [Y] 1-9 * Claims, Examples *; | [Y]US2009012321 (ANNEN KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * Claims, Example 1 * |