Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020250447 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP23764 | 14.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022239431 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP23764 | 14.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7351909B | Global Dossier | 27.09.2023 | B2 | JPWO2020250447 | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP23764 | 14.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114223283 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP23764 | 14.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3986049 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2023 | A4 | EP3986049 | 20.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP23764 | 14.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021015284 | 18.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP23764 | 14.06.2019 |