EP3986049 - TERMINAL AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMURA, Masaya c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
HARADA, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 19932752.9 | 14.06.2019 | [2022/16] | WO2019JP23764 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020250447 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986049 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W52/36 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04B7/0456 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W52/367 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/16] | English: | TERMINAL AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2022/16] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION RADIOÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2021 | Translation filed | 30.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2015170435 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [Y] 3 * , paragraph [0148] *; | [XY] - VIVO, "Outcome of offline discussion on Full TX Power UL transmission", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #97 R1- 1907886, (20190517), URL: https://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_97/Docs/Rl-1907886.zip, (20191202), XP051740147 [X] 1, 6 * , entire text * [Y] 2-5 | [Y] - OPPO, "Discussion on UL transmission mode design", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #90b Rl-1718026, (20171013), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_90b/Docs/Rl-1718026.zip, (20191202), XP051341208 [Y] 2, 4 * , entire text * | [Y] - NOKIA et al., "UL-MIMO diversity- based transmission", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 adhoc_NR_AH_1709 R1-1716492, (20170921), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1709/Dots/R1-1716492.zip, (20191202), XP051339945 [Y] 5 * , entire text * |