Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
02.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.03.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
21.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.01.2022 | Change - representative | |
05.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |