EP3942388 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING SERVERS ON A RACK AND ASSIGNING THE PROPER IP ADDRESSES TO THE SERVERS BASED ON THEIR PHYSICAL LOCATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Vantara LLC 2535 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Francis Kin-Wing c/o Hitachi Vantara Corporation 2535 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, William c/o Hitachi Vantara Corporation 2535 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 03 /
CRUZ, Art c/o Hitachi Vantara Corporation 2535 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 04 /
WAGH, Utkarsh Purushottam c/o Hitachi Vantara Corporation 2535 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 05 /
KANDLIKAR, Yogesh c/o Hitachi Vantara Corporation 2535 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
HONG, Francis Kin-Wing Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
02 /
NGUYEN, William Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
03 /
CRUZ, Art Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
04 /
WAGH, Utkarsh Purushottam Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
05 /
KANDLIKAR, Yogesh Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 19934123.1 | 17.06.2019 | [2022/04] | WO2019US37521 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020256691 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942388 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3942388 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L61/5007 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H04L61/5038 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (EP,US);
H04L61/5061 (US);
H04L2101/668 (EP,US);
H04L2101/69 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | G06F3/00, G06F9/46, G06F13/00, G06F15/16, G06F15/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON SERVERN AUF EINEM RACK UND ZUWEISEN DER RICHTIGEN IP-ADRESSEN ZU DEN SERVERN BASIEREND AUF IHREN PHYSIKALISCHEN STANDORTEN | [2022/04] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING SERVERS ON A RACK AND ASSIGNING THE PROPER IP ADDRESSES TO THE SERVERS BASED ON THEIR PHYSICAL LOCATIONS | [2022/04] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER DES SERVEURS SUR UN BÂTI ET ATTRIBUER LES ADRESSES IP APPROPRIÉES AUX SERVEURS SUR LA BASE DE LEURS EMPLACEMENTS PHYSIQUES | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005262218 (COX GABRIEL C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0021] *; | [A]US2010289620 (AMINGER HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0020] , [0022] *; | [I]CN107135269 (SHENZHEN JIEYUN TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] - [0026] , [0036] , [0039] , [0052] , [0053] , [0056] - [0058] - [0061] - [0062] - [0072] - [0078]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2005125575 (ALAPPAT KURIAPPAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2005262218 (COX GABRIEL C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2011075590 (KORMANN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2014006597 (GANGULI MRITTIKA [IN], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [A] - GITE, Vivek, "Linux Server Uptime Command To Find Out How Long The System Has Been Running", nixCraft, (20190529), URL: https://www.cyberciti.biz/faq/server-uptime-command-to-find-out-how-long-the-system-has-been-running, (20190815), XP055776991 [A] 1-15 * entire document * | by applicant | US2005262218 | US7340538 | US2010289620 |