EP3989657 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDICATION OF IN-DEVICE COEXISTENCE INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Xiaowei No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19934286.6 | 18.06.2019 | [2022/17] | WO2019CN91759 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020252664 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989657 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04J11/00, H04L5/00, H04W88/06 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H04J11/0023 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0073 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0094 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON KOEXISTENZINTERFERENZ IN EINER VORRICHTUNG | [2022/17] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDICATION OF IN-DEVICE COEXISTENCE INTERFERENCE | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'INDICATION D'INTERFÉRENCE DE COEXISTENCE INTRA-DISPOSITIF | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | Translation filed | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB2512877 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [Y]WO2019095254 (APPLE INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]CN102457885 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN102595543 (ZTE CORP); | [Y]CN103391180 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP); | [Y]WO2015013924 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN108401537 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); |