EP3819692 - ADJUSTMENT STRUCTURE AND ADJUSTMENT METHOD THEREFOR, SEAL, COAXIAL LINE, GIMBAL AND MOVABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. 6/F Hkust SZ IER Bldg. 9, Yuexing 1st Road Hi Tech Park (South) Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhiyuan 6F HKUST SZ IER Bldg. No.9 Yuexing 1st Rd. Hi-Tech Park (South) Nanshan District Shenzhen City Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LI, Liang 6F HKUST SZ IER Bldg. No.9 Yuexing 1st Rd. Hi-Tech Park (South) Nanshan District Shenzhen City Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
XU, Zhenhua 6F HKUST SZ IER Bldg. No.9 Yuexing 1st Rd. Hi-Tech Park (South) Nanshan District Shenzhen City Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19934378.1 | 23.09.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019CN107361 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021056157 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819692 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, B64D47/08, F16M11/10, F16M11/12, F16M11/16, F16M11/18, F16M11/20, F16M13/02, F16M13/04, G03B17/56 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
F16M11/123 (EP,US);
F16M11/043 (CN);
F16J15/061 (CN);
F16J15/16 (CN);
F16M11/06 (CN);
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/121 (CN);
F16M11/16 (EP);
F16M11/18 (EP,CN,US);
F16M11/2071 (EP);
F16M11/2085 (EP);
F16M11/2092 (EP);
F16M13/02 (EP);
F16M13/04 (EP,US);
G03B17/561 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | G02B7/02, B64D47/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | JUSTIERUNGSSTRUKTUR, JUSTIERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, ABDICHTUNGSELEMENT, KOAXIALKABEL, KARDANISCHE AUFHÄNGUNG UND MOBILES GERÄT | [2021/19] | English: | ADJUSTMENT STRUCTURE AND ADJUSTMENT METHOD THEREFOR, SEAL, COAXIAL LINE, GIMBAL AND MOVABLE DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | STRUCTURE DE RÉGLAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE, JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ, LIGNE COAXIALE, CARDAN ET DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | Translation filed | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/32] | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN201937731U (YAAN TECHNOLOGY ELECTRONIC CO LTD); | [XA]US2017174362 (ZHAO TAO [CN], et al); | [A]US2018149949 (KIM SEUNG JIN [KR], et al) |