EP3991753 - TRANSFECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Naoyuki c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 02 /
YANAI, Shigeo c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 19934422.7 | 26.06.2019 | [2022/18] | WO2019JP25506 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020261464 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991753 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/26, A61K9/10, A61K47/32, A61K48/00, A61K9/00, A61K9/51, C12N15/11, C12N15/87 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/0009 (EP);
A61K41/0028 (US);
A61K48/0033 (US);
A61K48/0083 (US);
A61K9/5123 (EP);
A61K9/5138 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12N15/87 (EP);
C12N15/88 (US);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | A61K47/26, A61K9/10, A61K47/32, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | TRANSFEKTIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/18] | English: | TRANSFECTION METHOD | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFECTION | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2021 | Translation filed | 21.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009052057 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-8 * * figure 2 ** paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0045] *; | [X]WO2012132141 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-19 * * page 10 - page 40 *; | [A]WO2013170235 (UNIV HAWAII [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0070] * * claims 1-60 *; | [X]EP2674172 (LUDWIG BOLTZMANN GES [AT]) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0057] *; | [X]US2014212502 (LIU TSE-YING [TW]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0047] * * claims 1-23 * | International search | [Y]JP2005154282 (MEBIOPHARM CO LTD) [Y] 1, 4-14 * , example 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2006126267 (MEBIOPHARM CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 4-14 * , example 1 *; | [A]WO2012132141 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , claims 1-19, paragraphs [0006], [0012], [0014], [0015], examples 1-11 *; | [Y]WO2014030601 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [Y] 1, 4-14 * , examples 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2015182647 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , claims 1-10 *; | [Y]JP2017019736 (UNIV CHIBA) [Y] 1, 4-14 * , paragraphs [0029], [0030], example 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y] - SHANG, M. et al., "Development of novel ST68/PLA- PEG stabilized ultrasound nanobabbles for potential tumor imaging and theranostic", Ultrasonics, (20190702), vol. 99, XP085959484 [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultras.2019.105947 | by applicant | WO2012153635 | WO2015182647 | - YAKUGAKU ZASSHI, (20100000), vol. 130, no. 11, pages 1489 - 1496 | - NATURE REVIEWS, (20160000), vol. 12, pages 161 - 174 | - Drug Delivery, (20170000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 320 - 327 |