EP3993192 - EXHAUST TOOL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SWITCHING DEVICE USING SUCH TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/18] | EXHAUST TOOL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SWITCHING DEVICE USING SAME | ||
[2024/34] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Shintaro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TSURIMOTO, Takao c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MORITO, Eiji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
KUROAKI, Shintaro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Engineering Company, Limited, 1-13-5, Kudankita, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 19934674.3 | 27.06.2019 | [2022/18] | WO2019JP25583 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020261482 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993192 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02B3/00, // H02B13/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H02B3/00 (EP);
H02B13/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | H02B3/00, H02G5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ENTLÜFTUNGSWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHALTANLAGE UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESES WERKZEUGS | [2024/37] | English: | EXHAUST TOOL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SWITCHING DEVICE USING SUCH TOOL | [2024/34] | French: | OUTIL D'ÉVACUATION DE L'AIR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION UTILISANT UN TEL OUTIL | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/18] | AUSPUFF UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2022/18] | EXHAUST TOOL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SWITCHING DEVICE USING SAME | ||
Former [2022/18] | OUTIL D'ÉVACUATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION L'UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | Translation filed | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 05.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2017022618 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]CN207994556U (LI ZHENG) | International search | [A]WO2017022618 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2018235162 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | by applicant | WO2017022618 |