EP3981719 - DECELERATION CUTTING CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Lyric Robot Automation Co., Ltd. No. 4 Xinpeng Road, Ma'an Town Huicheng District Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Junjie No. 4 Xinpeng Road Ma'an Town Huicheng District Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Minglang No. 4 Xinpeng Road Ma'an Town Huicheng District Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | 03 /
CAI, Wenjie No. 4 Xinpeng Road Ma'an Town Huicheng District Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | 04 /
XU, Tianfeng No. 4 Xinpeng Road Ma'an Town Huicheng District Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | 05 /
LI, Feng No. 4 Xinpeng Road Ma'an Town Huicheng District Huizhou Guangdong 516000 / CN | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 19935304.6 | 30.11.2019 | [2022/15] | WO2019CN122244 | Priority number, date | CN201910574818 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910574818 | [2022/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020258722 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981719 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/00, B26D5/00, B26D5/32, B26D5/34, G05B19/416 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B26D5/00 (EP);
B26D5/007 (EP);
B26D5/26 (EP);
B26D5/32 (EP);
B26D5/34 (EP);
B65H35/0073 (CN);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/01 (CN);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/02 (CN) |
Former IPC [2022/15] | B65H35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON SCHNEIDEN NACH ENTSCHLEUNIGUNG | [2022/15] | English: | DECELERATION CUTTING CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL APPARATUS | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DÉCOUPE PAR DÉCÉLÉRATION ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2022 | Translation filed | 05.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4163405 (DIESCH ROBERT E [US], et al); | [X]US5041070 (BLASER GILES R [US]); | [XI]US5079981 (SINGER KARL [US], et al); | [XA]GB2491080 (DUPLO SEIKO CORP [JP]); | [E]JP2021017310 (DUPLO SEIKO CORP); |