EP3996435 - TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIOKA, Shohei c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Yuki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
WANG, Lihui c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd., 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A, No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 19935955.5 | 04.07.2019 | [2022/19] | WO2019JP26720 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021002012 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996435 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/19] | English: | TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2022/19] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2022 | Translation filed | 21.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 29.07.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019102531 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-6 * [0053]-[0088], 3-5 *; | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "PUSCH enhancements for NR URLLC", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #97 R1-1906666, (20190504), XP051708702 [A] 1-6 * 2.5 * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, "Summary for Rel-15 UL transmission procedure", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #96b Rl-1905608, (20190408), pages 9 - 10, XP051707666 [A] 1-6 |