EP4000326 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR LOAD BALANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Huaisong No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Chunhui ET2, No.5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19937681.5 | 17.07.2019 | [2022/21] | WO2019CN96396 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007820 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000326 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L45/12, H04L47/125, H04W28/08, // H04B7/0452 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04W28/0861 (EP,US);
H04L45/123 (EP,US);
H04L45/124 (EP,US);
H04L47/125 (EP);
H04W16/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | H04W72/02, H04W72/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LASTAUSGLEICH | [2022/21] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR LOAD BALANCE | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS D'ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017148535 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 12 - line 26 * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 18 ** figure 2 *; | [Y]US2019132778 (PARK KYUNGMIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0161]; figures 15,35 * * paragraph [0165] * * paragraph [0310] *; | [Y] - ERICSSON, "Enhancements to load sharing and load balance", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190216), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-190825 - ENHANCEMENTS TO LOAD SHARING AND LOAD BALANCING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F103/Docs/R3%2D190825%2Ezip, (20190216), XP051604759 [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,3 * * two last paragraphs; page 1 * * first paragraph; page 2 * * chapter 2.3.2; page 4 * | International search | [A]US2018323842 (MAJMUNDAR MILAP [US], et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [A]CN109152083 (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS SHANGHAI INC) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X] - ERICSSON, "Enhancements to load sharing and load balance R3-190825", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 #103, (20190301), XP051604759 [X] 1-30 * Part 2 * | by applicant | WO2017148535 | US2019132778 |