EP4005753 - RAZOR HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kai R & D Center Co., Ltd. 1110, Oyana Seki-shi, Gifu 501-3992 / JP | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO Kengo c/o KAI R&D CENTER CO., LTD., 1110, Oyana Seki-shi, Gifu 501-3992 / JP | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 19939658.1 | 10.09.2019 | [2022/22] | WO2019JP35478 | Priority number, date | JP20190141292 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019141292 | JP20190158480 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019158480 | [2022/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019794 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005753 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/22, B26B21/40 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B26B21/4012 (EP,US);
B26B21/14 (KR);
B26B21/227 (EP);
B26B21/222 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | B26B21/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | RASIERKOPF | [2022/22] | English: | RAZOR HEAD | [2022/22] | French: | TÊTE DE RASOIR | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | Translation filed | 18.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9916592 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [A] 1-5* figures 2, 9 *; | [A]WO2008002069 (DORCO CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0031]; figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]JP2013099467 (FEATHER SAFETY RAZOR CO LTD) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036]; figures 2, 3 *; | [XAY]EP2823941 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0 28]; figures 2, 2A, 10 * [A] 3 [Y] 5 | International search | [A]JPH10506813 [A] 1-5* , 6 20 - 9 18, 1-10 *; | [A]JP2002510235 [A] 1-5 * , 6 15-10 4 1-11 *; | [XA]JP2011520554 [X] 1, 4-5 * , [0009]-[0044], 1A-11 * [A] 2-3; | [A]JP2018511375 [A] 1-5 * , [0007]-[0026], 1-6 * | by applicant | JPS5313339B |