EP3979016 - MACHINE TOOL, METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TOOL LOAD OF MACHINE TOOL, AND PROGRAM FOR MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamazaki Mazak Corporation 1-131 Takeda Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Jun c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corporation, 1-131, Takeda, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Yuuki c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corporation, 1-131, Takeda, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | 03 /
KATAYAMA, Takuro c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corporation, 1-131, Takeda, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | 04 /
KIMURA, Morikuni c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corporation, 1-131, Takeda, Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0197 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 19940475.7 | 07.08.2019 | [2022/14] | WO2019JP31243 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021024438 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979016 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, B23Q17/09, G05B19/4069, G05B19/4093 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G05B19/4069 (EP);
G05B19/4063 (US);
G05B19/409 (EP);
G05B19/4093 (EP);
G05B2219/36089 (EP);
G05B2219/37076 (EP);
G05B2219/49086 (EP);
G05B2219/50255 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINE, VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE DER WERKZEUGAUSLASTUNG EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE UND PROGRAMM FÜR EINE WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2022/14] | English: | MACHINE TOOL, METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TOOL LOAD OF MACHINE TOOL, AND PROGRAM FOR MACHINE TOOL | [2022/14] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL, PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE DE CHARGE D'OUTIL DE MACHINE-OUTIL ET PROGRAMME POUR MACHINE-OUTIL | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2021 | Translation filed | 27.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014180467 (SATO KAZUO [JP], et al); | [XI]US2016048616 (NAGATA DAISUKE [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH0857744 (NAKAMURA TOME PRECISION IND) [A] 1-15 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11129141 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2004227028 (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD) [X] 1, 9, 11-12, 15 * , paragraphs [0015]-[0078], fig. 1-15 (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 10, 13 [A] 3-8, 14; | [A]JP2013037383 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15* , entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2018180586 (FANUC LTD) [Y] 2, 10, 13 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0053], fig. 1-6 * | by applicant | JP2004126956 | JP2006053945 |