EP4021262 - DISPENSER FOR ROLLS OF ABSORBENT PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZERWECK, Jason c/o Bresslergroup 7th Floor, 1216 Arch Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19107 / US | 02 /
KASILAG, Christian c/o Bresslergroup 7th Floor, 1216 Arch Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19107 / US | 03 /
STACHOWSKI, Bre c/o Bresslergroup 7th Floor, 1216 Arch Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19107 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 19942796.4 | 30.08.2019 | [2022/27] | WO2019SE50814 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040593 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021262 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4021262 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/38 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A47K10/3818 (EP);
A47K10/38 (US);
A47K10/3836 (EP);
A47K2010/3253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDER FÜR ROLLEN VON SAUGFÄHIGEM PAPIER | [2022/27] | English: | DISPENSER FOR ROLLS OF ABSORBENT PAPER | [2022/27] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR POUR ROULEAUX DE PAPIER ABSORBANT | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016037979 (MATTHEEUSSEN STEVEN B [US], et al); | [A]EP2934259 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]) | International search | [A]US5265816 (COLLINS SCOTT J [US]); | [A]US5645244 (MOODY JOHN R [US]); | [A]US5954256 (NIADA GIANANDREA [IT]); | [A]DE10316790 (ENGLEWOOD VENTURES INC [CA]) | by applicant | US5265816 | US5645244 | US5954256 | DE10316790 | US2009072072 |