EP4021683 - POWER TOOL FOR GENERATING AN INSTANTANEOUS TORQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Cordless GP 100 Innovation Way Anderson, SC 29621 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Li Guo No. 1, Chuang Ke Road Houjie Town Industrial Park Houjie Town Dongguan, Guangdong 523945 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Jing Feng No. 1, Chuang Ke Road Houjie Town Industrial Park Houjie Town Dongguan, Guangdong 523945 / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Rui No. 1, Chuang Ke Road Houjie Town Industrial Park Houjie Town Dongguan, Guangdong 523945 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2023/51] |
Former [2022/27] | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 19942829.3 | 27.08.2019 | [2022/27] | WO2019CN102722 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021035512 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021683 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4021683 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/02 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B25B21/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROWERKZEUG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES UNMITTELBAREN DREHMOMENTS | [2022/27] | English: | POWER TOOL FOR GENERATING AN INSTANTANEOUS TORQUE | [2022/27] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE DESTINÉ À GÉNÉRER UN COUPLE INSTANTANÉ | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1454715 (INGERSOLL RAND CO [US]) [X] 1,20,21,23 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-10D * [A] 2-17,22,24,25 [I] 18,19; | [XAI]EP1454714 (INGERSOLL RAND CO [US]) [X] 1,20,21,23 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-9D * [A] 2-17,22,24,25 [I] 18,19; | [A]WO2018054311 (POSITEC POWER TOOLS SUZHOU CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1* abstract * |