EP3997837 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURITY MANAGEMENT ON A MOBILE STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Daifei 5-402, Building 1, An Ning Zhuang Jin Shun Jiayuan No. 56 XiaoYingXi Lu HaiDian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Wen 304-3-1201 WangJingShangJingXinHangXian, Chaoyang District Beijing 100012 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19942947.3 | 23.08.2019 | [2022/20] | WO2019CN102329 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021035429 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997837 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/56, G06F3/06, G06K19/077 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G06F21/565 (EP,US);
G06F21/78 (US);
G06F21/552 (US);
G06F21/564 (US);
G06F21/73 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SICHERHEITSVERWALTUNG IN EINER MOBILEN SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURITY MANAGEMENT ON A MOBILE STORAGE DEVICE | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE LA SÉCURITÉ SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE MOBILE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20070017609 (EAGLEYE. CO.LTD) [A] 19,30* see paragraph whose translation starts with "In order to achieve the object of the present invention"; page 4 *; | [A]US2009172406 (CAO DIANSONG [CN]) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] - [0 33] , [0 37] *; | [IA]US2015302211 (KIM TAI HYO [KR]) [I] 18,19,29,30,33,34 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0 64] , [0094] * [A] 1-17,20-28,31,32 |