EP4021064 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Wei No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Steinbauer, Florian Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19943570.2 | 23.08.2019 | [2022/26] | WO2019CN102150 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021035381 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021064 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4021064 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/10 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H04W76/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/0236 (US);
H04W48/06 (US);
H04W8/22 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/26] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2022 | Translation filed | 22.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 21.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20190090368 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15; | US2019383865 [ ] (SIM MYOSEOP [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0115]; figure 3 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Radio Resource Control (RRC) protocol specification (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20190629), vol. RAN WG2, no. V15.6.0, pages 1 - 519, XP051754472 [X] 1,14 * paragraph [5.3.3] * * paragraph [6.2.2] * |