Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
18.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.04.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
07.04.2023 | Change - classification | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
07.04.2023 | Change - classification | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
11.11.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
11.11.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
20.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
06.05.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
30.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.03.2022 | Change - representative | |
02.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.03.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |