EP4027294 - 3D DATA SYSTEM, SERVER, AND 3D DATA PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VRC Inc. MZ Bldg. 301C 2-26-9 Myojincho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0046 / JP | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Yingdi c/o VRC Inc., MZ Bldg. 301C, 2-26-9, Myojincho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0046 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Michiaki c/o VRC Inc., MZ Bldg. 301C, 2-26-9, Myojincho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0046 / JP | 03 /
WU, Yazhen c/o VRC Inc., MZ Bldg. 301C, 2-26-9, Myojincho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0046 / JP | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 19944101.5 | 05.09.2019 | [2022/28] | WO2019JP34919 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021044568 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027294 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06T17/00, G06F21/44, G06F21/62, H04L9/40, G06F21/12, G06Q10/101 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G06F21/121 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (EP,CN);
G06F21/6218 (US);
G06F21/44 (EP);
G06F21/6272 (EP);
G06Q10/101 (EP);
G06Q50/01 (EP);
G06T17/00 (CN);
G06T19/20 (US);
H04L63/0876 (EP);
H04L63/102 (EP);
G06F2221/2109 (EP);
G06F2221/2141 (CN);
G06Q2220/18 (EP);
G06T2219/024 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | G06Q50/00, G06T17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | 3D-DATENSYSTEM, SERVER UND 3D-DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/28] | English: | 3D DATA SYSTEM, SERVER, AND 3D DATA PROCESSING METHOD | [2022/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DONNÉES 3D, SERVEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DES DONNÉES 3D | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2022 | Translation filed | 11.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 20.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014325229 (BACASTOW STEVEN V [US]); | [XI]EP2907073 (CITRIX SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [I]US2019205563 (GONZALES JR SERGIO PINZON [US]); | [I]US2019213311 (TUSSY KEVIN ALAN [US]) | International search | [A]JP2003186922 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2005208854 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2012243319 (THOMSON LICENSING); | [A]JP2017146818 (CANON KK) | by applicant | JP6489726B |